FL H1305 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Chapter No. 2023-70; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 425 (Ch. 2023-197)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Chapter No. 2023-70; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 425 (Ch. 2023-197)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum amount of debt service coverage that must be transferred from the State Transportation Trust Fund to the Right-of-Way Acquisition and Bridge Construction Trust Fund; authorizing the department to provide up to 100 percent of project costs for certain eligible projects in rural areas of opportunity; authorizing installation of an automated license plate recognition system within the right-of-way of any road on the State Highway System for a specified purpose; prohibiting use of such system for certain purposes, etc.
Title
Department of Transportation
Sponsors
House Infrastructure Strategies Committee | House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | House Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | Rep. Shane Abbott [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#470 (Y: 83 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#307 (Y: 87 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House Infrastructure Strategies Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Transportation & Modals Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#307 (Y: 87 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House Infrastructure Strategies Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Transportation & Modals Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Chapter No. 2023-70; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 425 (Ch. 2023-197) | |
2023-05-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-05-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-05-03 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2023-05-03 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 83, NAYS 32 |
2023-05-03 | House | Amendment 441338 Concur |
2023-05-03 | House | Amendment 463157 Failed |
2023-05-03 | House | Amendment 809834 Concur |
2023-05-03 | House | Amendment 686587 Failed |
2023-05-03 | House | Added to Senate Message List |
2023-05-02 | House | In Messages |
2023-05-02 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 26 NAYS 14 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (441338, 809834) |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 1250 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Received |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-28 | Senate | In Messages |
2023-04-27 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 87, NAYS 28 |
2023-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-27 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-04-27 | House | Amendment 120653 adopted |
2023-04-27 | House | Amendment 236265 superseded by substitute |
2023-04-27 | House | Amendment 095925 adopted |
2023-04-27 | House | Amendment 055995 adopted as amended |
2023-04-27 | House | Amendment 598081 adopted |
2023-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-24 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2023) |
2023-04-21 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-21 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-04-20 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3) |
2023-04-20 | House | CS Filed |
2023-04-20 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-04-13 | House | Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda |
2023-04-12 | House | Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2023-04-11 | House | CS Filed |
2023-04-11 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-04-11 | House | Favorable with CS by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-04-06 | House | Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-31 | House | Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-31 | House | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-03-31 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-30 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-30 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-30 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Favorable with CS by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2023-03-27 | House | PCS added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-06 | House | Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2023-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1250 (Similar To) 2023-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 425 (Ch. 2023-197), CS/CS/CS/HB 1305 (Ch. 2023-70)
H425 (Similar To) 2023-06-06 - Chapter No. 2023-197; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1305 (Ch. 2023-70)
H937 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
S64 (Similar To) 2023-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 425 (Ch. 2023-197), CS/CS/CS/HB 1305 (Ch. 2023-70)
S1672 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Messages; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1305 (Ch. 2023-70)
H425 (Similar To) 2023-06-06 - Chapter No. 2023-197; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1305 (Ch. 2023-70)
H937 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
S64 (Similar To) 2023-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 425 (Ch. 2023-197), CS/CS/CS/HB 1305 (Ch. 2023-70)
S1672 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Messages; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1305 (Ch. 2023-70)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
189 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 46 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 616 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
311 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 0777 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
330 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
330 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
332 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
334 | 044 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 03031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0309 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 965 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 966 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 967 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 968 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 969 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 97 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 972 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 974 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9751 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9761 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9771 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 9781 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |