FL H1291 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Terminates obsolete trust funds & provides for disposition of balances; revises distributions of documentary stamp tax revenues into certain trust funds; revises distributions of revenues upon sale of certain lands; reenacts the Land Acquisition Trust Fund; deletes obsolete provisions relating to use of bond & trust fund proceeds; conforms provisions.
Title
Implementation of Water and Land Conservation Constitutional Amendment
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Boyd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | Laid on Table |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-30 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/15 |
2015-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 27 NAYS 1 |
2015-03-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/19/15, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2015-03-11 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/11/15, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2015-03-06 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1293 (Related) 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table
H1295 (Related) 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table
S0584 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in returning Messages
S0586 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
S2500 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in returning Messages
H5001 (Similar To) 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table
H7135 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
S7086 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
H1295 (Related) 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table
S0584 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in returning Messages
S0586 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
S2500 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in returning Messages
H5001 (Similar To) 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table
H7135 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
S7086 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
161 | 05301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
161 | 054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
161 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
201 | 0205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
201 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
211 | 3103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 618 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 619 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
253 | 027 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
253 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
253 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
253 | 7824 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
258 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
258 | 435 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
259 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
259 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
259 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
259 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
259 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
259 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
259 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
259 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
259 | 1051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 0595 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 0801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 2818 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 2819 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 58 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
369 | 252 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 089 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 129 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 1391 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 199 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 430 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 459 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 4592 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 45926 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 470 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 584 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 59 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 5905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
375 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
375 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
375 | 044 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
375 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
375 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
375 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 214 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 0666 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 0677 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 507 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 508 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 510 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 0615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 08601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 1651 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 885 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 8911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 9325 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 93345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 9073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 9079 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
895 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1291 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1291/BillText/Filed/PDF |