FL H1287 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for survey of certain City of Vero Beach electric utility customers to transfer provision of their electric service to specified investor-owned electric utility; authorizes PSC, if survey is approved by majority of affected electric utility customers & after public hearing, to open territorial agreement & transfer affected electric utility customers to jurisdiction of investor-owned electric utility.
Title
City of Vero Beach and Town of Indian River Shores, Indian River County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-02 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1287 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1287/BillText/Filed/PDF |