FL H1281 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-12 - Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits state, county, municipality, or another political subdivision from requiring participation in paid subscription service to access details of certain solicitations of competitive bids or proposals for construction projects; prohibits local enforcing agency from making or requiring substantive change to certain plans & specifications; provides exception.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Building Construction Policies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-12HouseNow in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2022-01-12HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2022-01-12HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2022-01-12HouseReferred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S976 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Introduced
H635 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
S1020 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2550525Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55379Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback