FL S1020 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Community Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying that local building code administrators and certain marshals and inspectors do not have discretionary authority to change certain building plans under specified circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Building Plans

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2021-12-13SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2021-11-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H635 (Same As) 2022-01-21 - CS Filed
S976 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Introduced
H1281 (Similar To) 2022-01-12 - Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
55379Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback