FL H1279 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises duties of Auditor General; revises provisions relating to Office of Inspector General, district school boards, school district superintendents, Commission on Ethics, & DOE duties & responsibilities; provides appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School District Accountability

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#822 (Y: 96 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#665 (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12 Chapter No. 2018-5
2018-03-11 Approved by Governor
2018-03-09 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-05HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2018-03-05HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 96 NAYS 16
2018-03-05HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (769224)
2018-03-05HouseIn returning messages
2018-03-05SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 31 NAYS 6
2018-03-05SenateAmendment(s) adopted (769224)
2018-03-05SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-02SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1804
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-02SenateWithdrawn from Education; Appropriations
2018-02-28SenateReceived
2018-02-28SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations
2018-02-28SenateIn Messages
2018-02-21HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 109 NAYS 5
2018-02-21HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-20HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-20HouseAmendment(s) ruled out of order (871173)
2018-02-20HouseAmendment(s) adopted (235917)
2018-02-20HouseRead 2nd time 636
2018-02-15HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/20/18
2018-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-08HouseCS/CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time
2018-02-08HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-07HouseCS/CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-02-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/07/18, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
2018-01-31HouseCS/CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-31HouseNow in Education Committee
2018-01-30HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-30HouseCS/CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-01-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 8:00 am, Reed Hall
2018-01-19HouseNow in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-01-18HouseCS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-18HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-17HouseCS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2018-01-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, 01/17/18, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall
2018-01-12HouseReferred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1804 (Similar To) 2018-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1279
H11 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
H7003 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
S354 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
S1534 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
H7055 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-6
H323 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 88
H7073 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100120Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100139Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1001395Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002395Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101020Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101030Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1011035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1011051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101109Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101110Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101160Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101164Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101223Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
112313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11231455Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1279
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1279/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1279/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1279/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1279/BillText/c3/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1279/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1279/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1279/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1279/Amendment/204527/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1279/Amendment/014235/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1279/Amendment/072115/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1279/Amendment/258905/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1279/Amendment/798619/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1279/Amendment/560259/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1279/Amendment/235917/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1279/Amendment/871173/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1279/Vote/HouseVote_h01279e1665.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1279/Vote/SenateVote_h01279e1016.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1279/Vote/HouseVote_h01279e1822.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback