FL H0011 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Governor & Commissioner of Education, or their designees, to notify Legislative Auditing Committee of entity's failure to comply with certain auditing & financial reporting requirements; excludes water management districts from certain audit requirements; revises reporting requirements applicable to Florida Clerks of Court Operations Corporation; revises certain lodging rates for purpose of reimbursement to specified employees; provides requirements for statewide travel management system; revises responsibilities of specified entities to include establishment & maintenance of certain internal controls; revises auditing requirements for certain agencies, councils, & state schools; requires the Legislative Auditing Committee to determine whether governmental entity should be subject to state action under certain circumstances; requires counties & municipalities to maintain certain budget documents on entities' websites for specified period; provides annual financial audit requirements for Florida Virtual School.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Government Accountability

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#504 (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Community Affairs
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-31SenateReceived
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Appropriations; Rules
2018-01-24SenateIn Messages
2018-01-12HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 101 NAYS 1 331
2018-01-12HouseRead 3rd time
2018-01-11HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-01-11HouseAmendment(s) adopted (105187)
2018-01-11HouseRead 2nd time
2018-01-09HouseCS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/11/18
2017-11-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-11-07HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-11-07HouseCS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 1
2017-10-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 11/07/17, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall
2017-09-06HouseReferred to Government Accountability Committee
2017-08-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S354 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
H1019 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
S1804 (Similar To) 2018-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1279
H1279 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-5
H5203 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H7055 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-6
H7073 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
S1426 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100237Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101030Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1140Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
112061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12903Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12906Amended CodeSee Bill Text
166241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21586Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21597Amended CodeSee Bill Text
215985Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21832Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21833Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21839Amended CodeSee Bill Text
218391Amended CodeSee Bill Text
218503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2835Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2860114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373536Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4316Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback