FL H1265 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that each supervisor of elections shall require preservation of certain ballots & digital images of ballots for certain period; requires certain person to release copies of digital images of ballots to parties of a recount.
Title
Preservation of Ballots and Digital Images of Ballots
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - House Public Integrity & Elections Committee (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Reported out of Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Favorable by Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Added to Public Integrity & Elections Committee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-28 | House | Now in Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1698 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Ethics and Elections