FL H1257 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers division to DLA by type two transfer by specified date; requires DBPR & DLA to enter into memorandum of agreement by specified date; requires DLA to develop rules & procedures for resolving certain disputes to include all possible means of alternative dispute resolution.
Title
Division of Florida Condominiums, Timeshares, and Mobile Homes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1378 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulated Industries
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
192 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
326 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
475 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
475 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
546 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
558 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 1255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 1255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 30851 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
721 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
721 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
721 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
721 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 0611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 06115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1257 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1257/BillText/Filed/PDF |