FL H1249 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions related to charter schools, promotion & graduation requirements, standard high school diploma designations, statewide, standardized assessment program, specified reports relating to student progression & school improvement, school grading system, & personnel evaluations.
Title
Education Accountability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S964 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
S926 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
H549 (Similar To) 2017-05-08 - See CS/HB 7069
H773 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2017-55), CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2017-177), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
H7069 (Similar To) 2017-06-16 - Chapter No. 2017-116, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 15 (Ch. 2017-166), CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2017-55), CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2017-177), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
S926 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
H549 (Similar To) 2017-05-08 - See CS/HB 7069
H773 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2017-55), CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2017-177), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
H7069 (Similar To) 2017-06-16 - Chapter No. 2017-116, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 15 (Ch. 2017-166), CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2017-55), CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2017-177), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4282 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4285 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 223 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 562 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1249 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1249/BillText/Filed/PDF |