FL H0549 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See CS/HB 7069
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Deleting a provision requiring students to pass the Algebra II end-of-course assessment in order to earn a Scholar designation; revising requirements relating to the administration and format of assessments; requiring independent analysis of student learning growth data, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#36 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#342 (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08HouseSee CS/HB 7069
2017-05-05HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-05-04HouseIn returning messages
2017-05-04SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2017-05-04SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-04SenateAmendment(s) adopted (417416)
2017-05-04SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-04SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 926
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-05-04SenateWithdrawn from Education; Appropriations
2017-05-01SenateReceived
2017-04-30SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations
2017-04-28SenateIn Messages
2017-04-28HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 1
2017-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-27HouseAmendment(s) adopted (106089, 563511) 936
2017-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17
2017-04-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-04-20HouseCS/CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time
2017-04-20HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-04-20HouseCS/CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2017-04-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/20/17, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
2017-04-04HouseCS/CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2017-04-04HouseNow in Education Committee
2017-04-03HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-04-03HouseCS/CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2017-03-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/03/17, 11:30 am, Reed Hall
2017-03-24HouseNow in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-03-22HouseCS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
2017-03-22HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-03-20HouseCS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2017-03-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, 03/20/17, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-02-06HouseReferred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2017-01-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0906 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education
H773 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2017-55), CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2017-177), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
S926 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
S964 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
H1249 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
H7069 (Similar To) 2017-06-16 - Chapter No. 2017-116, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 15 (Ch. 2017-166), CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2017-55), CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2017-177), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10034282Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034285Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100822Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101234Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback