FL H1229 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provides legislative intent requiring DFS to review regulatory structure of title insurance industry & submit findings & recommendations to Legislature; repeals provision requiring assessments against title insurers; requires rehabilitation plans to provide for specified matters; provides methodology for allocation of funds to pay claims on out-of-state policies; provides procedures & requirements for imposition & payment of assessments; provides methodology for determining assessment amounts, etc.
Title
Title Insurance
Sponsors
House Economic Affairs Committee | Rep. Doug Holder [R] | House Insurance and Banking Subcommittee | Rep. William Snyder [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#418 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-29 | In Messages | |
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time -HJ 943 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/11 | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 836 | |
2011-04-25 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-04-21 | CS/CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 776 | |
2011-04-19 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/21/11, 11:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2011-04-13 | Favorable by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 619 | |
2011-04-11 | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/13/11, 8:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2011-04-06 | Original reference(s) removed: Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee | |
2011-04-05 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-30 | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 416 | |
2011-03-28 | PCS on Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/30/11, 10:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 220 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 108 | |
2011-03-04 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 782 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7865 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 400 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
701 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |