FL H1227 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1470 (Ch. 2016-208)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1470 (Ch. 2016-208)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises administrative penalties for violations related to stone crab traps & spiny lobster traps; prohibits possession of undersized spiny lobsters by certain persons; specifies that each undersized spiny lobster may be charged as separate offense; specifies criminal & administrative penalties for violations related to undersized spiny lobsters; revises offense severity ranking chart to include certain violations related to stone crabs & spiny lobsters.
Title
Crustaceans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1470 (Ch. 2016-208) |
2016-03-07 | House | Substituted CS/SB 1470 |
2016-03-04 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/16 |
2016-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-25 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-23 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/25/16, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2016-02-18 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/18/16, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2016-02-08 | House | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-02-08 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | CS referred to State Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-02-05 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-02 | House | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 02/02/16, 10:30 am, Reed Hall |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1470 (Same As) 2016-04-08 - Chapter No. 2016-208
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
379 | 365 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 3671 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |