FL H1215 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Abolishes municipality; transfers assets & legitimate liabilities of municipality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Weeki Wachee, Hernando County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#53 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#504 (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09 Approved by Governor
2020-05-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-11HouseOrdered enrolled
2020-03-11SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2020-03-11SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-11SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-11SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-11SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2020-03-09SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 03/11/20
2020-03-02SenateReceived
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Rules
2020-02-26SenateIn Messages
2020-02-26HouseCS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 1
2020-02-26HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-26HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-20HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/26/20
2020-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-06HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
2020-02-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/06/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-01-27HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2020-01-27HouseFavorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-01-23HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 01/27/20, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
2020-01-23HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2020-01-22HouseCS by Local Administration Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-22HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-22HouseCS by Local Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-01-17HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local Administration Subcommittee, 01/22/20, 9:30 am, Webster Hall
2020-01-17HouseReferred to Local Administration Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-09HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback