FL H1213 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides requirements for specified instruction relating to computer science; requires certain computer science courses to be included in Course Code Directory & published on DOE's website by specified date; provides funds for school districts to provide professional development for classroom teachers; authorizes bonuses for certain classroom teachers.
Title
Computer Science Instruction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died on Calendar |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-27 | House | Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/27/18, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2018-02-19 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-02-13 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-13 | House | CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/13/18, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2018-01-23 | House | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2018-01-23 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 9:00 am, Mashburn Hall |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S180 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
S1056 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 495
H495 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-150
S1056 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 495
H495 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-150