FL S1056 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 495
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 495
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain computer science courses to be included in the Course Code Directory and published on the Department of Education's website by a specified date; requiring the Florida Virtual School to offer certain computer science courses; providing funds for bonuses for certain classroom teachers, etc.
Title
Computer Science Instruction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 495 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 495 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-05 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education, 02/08/18, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2018-01-23 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/16/18, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1213 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S180 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
H495 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-150
S180 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
H495 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-150
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1007 | 2616 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 545 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |