FL H1213 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises criteria for state & local participation in authorized projects & studies relating to beach management & erosion control; revises procedures for prioritizing & funding beach restoration, beach management, & inlet management projects.
Title
Coastal Management
Sponsors
House Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | House Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee | Rep. Kathleen Peters [R] | Rep. George Moraitis [R] |
Rep. Bill Hager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Government Accountability Committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-31 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2017-03-30 | House | CS/CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-30 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-28 | House | CS/CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-03-23 | House | Now in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-03-21 | House | CS by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-21 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-20 | House | CS by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, 03/20/17, 12:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1590 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
161 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
161 | 143 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
161 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |