FL H1203 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Chapter No. 2017-114, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1201 (Ch. 2017-31)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Chapter No. 2017-114, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1201 (Ch. 2017-31)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that certain protected health information held by DOC is confidential & exempt from public records requirements; authorizes release of protected health information & other records of an inmate to certain entities, subject to specified conditions and; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./DOC/Health Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#273 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#273 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Chapter No. 2017-114, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1201 (Ch. 2017-31) | |
2017-06-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-03 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1526 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/17 |
2017-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-13 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/13/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2017-04-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/06/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall --Not Considered |
2017-03-28 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Favorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-03-21 | House | Now in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee |
2017-03-21 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1201 (Related) 2017-05-24 - Chapter No. 2017-31, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1203 (Ch. 2017-114)
S1526 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1203 (Ch. 2017-114), CS/CS/HB 1201 (Ch. 2017-31)
S1604 (Similar To) 2017-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1201 (Ch. 2017-31), HB 1203 (Ch. 2017-114)
H6045 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1203 (Ch. 2017-114)
S1526 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1203 (Ch. 2017-114), CS/CS/HB 1201 (Ch. 2017-31)
S1604 (Similar To) 2017-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1201 (Ch. 2017-31), HB 1203 (Ch. 2017-114)
H6045 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1203 (Ch. 2017-114)