FL H1199 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes school districts to install & operate side stop signal arm enforcement systems on school buses & to contract with private vendor or manufacturer to provide such systems; requires manufacturers & vendors to submit specified information to law enforcement agencies within specified timeframe; requires law enforcement agencies to review such information to determine whether violation occurred; provides notice requirements & procedures; provides that payment of fine operates as final disposition of civil penalty; provides notice requirements, procedures, & actions by DSHMV for unpaid civil penalties; specifies requirements of use of recorded video & still images captured by system; provides civil penalties & distribution thereof; requires annual report to Governor, Legislature, & DHSMV; requires & authorizes SBE to adopt rules.
Title
Photographic Enforcement of School Bus Safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - House PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-09 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-04-07 | House | Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-04-01 | House | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-28 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1440 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1006 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 616 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |