FL H1197 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions related to employee organizations including organizations for public employees, forms, dues & uniform assessments, applications for renewal of registration, recertification, & revocation of registration & certification.
Title
Employee Organizations Representing Public Employees
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Plakon [R] | Rep. Cord Byrd [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#707 (Y: 60 N: 47 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#706 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#706 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2022-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 60, NAYS 47 |
2022-03-04 | House | Amendment 031693 adopted |
2022-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-03 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) |
2022-02-28 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-27 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2022-02-08 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-27 | House | Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1458 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1012 | 2315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 507 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |