FL H1197 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Defines term "governmental entity"; prohibits certain governmental entities from charging stormwater management assessments or fees on certain bona fide farm operations except under certain circumstances; revises powers & duties of DOACS to enforce laws & rules relating to use of commercial stock feeds; authorizes apiaries to be located on certain lands; revises qualifications for certified Florida Farm Winery; provides exemption from Florida Building Code for farm signs, etc.
Title
Agriculture
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1102 (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#846 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1102 (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#846 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1145 | |
2012-03-06 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-06 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 33 NAYS 3 -SJ 890 | |
2012-03-06 | Read 3rd time -SJ 875 | |
2012-03-05 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-05 | Withdrawn from Agriculture; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 787 | |
2012-03-01 | Received -SJ 764 | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Agriculture; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 764 | |
2012-02-24 | In Messages | |
2012-02-23 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 764 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 3rd time -HJ 763 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-22 | Read 2nd time -HJ 715 | |
2012-02-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/22/12 | |
2012-02-13 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 581 | |
2012-02-10 | CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time -HJ 576 | |
2012-02-10 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-08 | CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 577 | |
2012-02-06 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/08/12, 8:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2012-01-31 | Now in State Affairs Committee -HJ 321 | |
2012-01-31 | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 321 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/31/12, 9:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-01-25 | Now in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 299 | |
2012-01-25 | Favorable by Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 298 | |
2012-01-23 | On Committee agenda-- Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 01/25/12, 8:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2012-01-17 | Now in Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee -HJ 229 | |
2012-01-17 | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 229 | |
2012-01-12 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 01/17/12, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 213 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 117 | |
2012-01-03 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 3162 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3163 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
193 | 461 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 9337 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 961 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
580 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
586 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
586 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
586 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
599 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
604 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
823 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
828 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |