FL H1193 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Renaming "Next Generation Sunshine State Standards" as "state academic standards"; revises provisions relating to statewide assessment program, DOE & school district requirements, & state accountability program; provides that certain end-of-year comprehensive progress monitoring assessments are statewide, standardized ELA & Mathematics assessments for certain students; & revises coordinated screening & progress monitoring program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

K-12 Assessments and Accountability

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseNow in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Education & Employment Committee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
2022-01-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1048 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 01/26/22, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100237Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100253Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100267Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100268Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100341Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100353Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10082125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100822Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100825Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100833Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100834Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1008341Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411227Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback