FL S1048 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Chapter No. 2022-16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Chapter No. 2022-16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Renaming "Next Generation Sunshine State Standards" as "state academic standards"; deleting provisions relating to the coordinated screening and progress monitoring program; providing that certain end-of-year comprehensive progress monitoring assessments are the statewide, standardized ELA and Mathematics assessments for certain students; requiring the coordinated screening and progress monitoring system to identify the educational strengths and needs of students; requiring 2022-2023 school and school district grades to serve as an informal baseline for schools and school districts; providing that school improvement ratings will not be calculated for the 2022-2023 school year, etc.
Title
Student Assessments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#842 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#841 (Y: 83 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Education (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#841 (Y: 83 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Education (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Chapter No. 2022-16 | |
2022-03-15 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | CS passed; YEAS 83, NAYS 31 |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-08 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Amendment 403671 Failed |
2022-03-08 | House | Amendment 686381 not allowed for consideration |
2022-03-08 | House | Amendment 911801 Failed |
2022-03-08 | House | Amendment 499457 Failed |
2022-03-08 | House | Amendment 531515 Failed |
2022-03-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/8/2022) |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-03-03 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-03 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (115190, 893130) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/09/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 01/26/22, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/11/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2021-11-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1193 (Similar To) 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1048
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1000 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 2125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
411 | 227 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |