FL H1189 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides defective corporate action is not void or voidable in certain circumstances; requires board of directors to take action to ratify defective corporate action; provides quorum & voting requirements for ratification of defective corporate actions; requires notice be given to shareholders of corporate action taken by board of directors; requires corporations to file articles of validation; provides registered agent may resign from companies by delivering specified statement of resignation to DOS; provides registered agents may pay one resignation fee regardless of whether resigning from one or multiple dissolved companies or corporations.
Title
Corporate Actions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Laid on Table |
2024-02-23 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | Favorable by Commerce Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2024-02-14 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-12 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2024-02-08 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Original reference removed: Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-07 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-07 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-07 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-02-02 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1198 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Ordered enrolled
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
252 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 8298 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
605 | 0113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
605 | 0115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
605 | 0207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
605 | 0213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 0122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 0145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 0146 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 0147 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 0148 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 0149 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 0151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 0152 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 0501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 0503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 193 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 0122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 0501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 0502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 0503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 1807 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 2006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
658 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |