FL H1175 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires facilities to provide patient with informed consent form before performing mammogram; requires form be signed by patient; requires facility to notify patient of form at specified time; requires facility to post form on its website; provides requirements for form; requires facility to include statement on summary of patient's mammography report; requires DOH to develop form.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Informed Consent for Mammograms

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseNow in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2022-01-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1460 (Similar To) 2022-01-12 - Referred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
381934Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback