FL H1175 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes early learning coalition to refuse to contract with or revoke the eligibility of certain school readiness program providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early Learning Coalitions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#627 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Education
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-26SenateReceived
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations
2018-02-20SenateIn Messages
2018-02-14HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 111 NAYS 0
2018-02-14HouseAmendment(s) adopted (329585)
2018-02-14HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2018-02-14HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-14HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
2018-01-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-25HouseFavorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2018-01-23HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 01/25/18, 10:00 am, Reed Hall
2018-01-19HouseNow in Education Committee
2018-01-18HouseCS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-18HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-17HouseCS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-01-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, 01/17/18, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-07HouseReferred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; Education Committee
2018-01-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1532 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H1297 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
H7055 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-6

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100288Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback