FL H1173 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-159
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing conditions under which specified appraisal standards are required, and such appraisal be provided to the seller, for the acquisition of lands for the purpose of buffering military installations against encroachment; authorizing the use of certain funding sources for the immediate acquisition of lands that prevent or satisfy private property rights claims within areas of critical state concern; revising the definition of the term "nonconservation lands"; authorizing land authorities to contribute tourist impact tax revenues to counties to pay for project costs relating to the construction, redevelopment, and preservation of certain affordable housing, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lands Used for Governmental Purposes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#883 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#800 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09 Chapter No. 2018-159
2018-04-06 Approved by Governor
2018-03-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-08HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2018-03-08HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 1104
2018-03-08HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (483474) 1103
2018-03-07HouseIn returning messages
2018-03-07SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-06SenateAmendment(s) adopted (483474) 746
2018-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1622
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-06SenateWithdrawn from Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations
2018-03-05SenateReceived
2018-03-05SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations
2018-03-05SenateIn Messages
2018-03-05HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseAmendment(s) adopted (095841)
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-28HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
2018-02-19HouseCS/CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time
2018-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-16HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-13HouseCS/CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2018-02-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/13/18, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-31HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-31HouseFavorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-01-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 01/31/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-29HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2018-01-26HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-26HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-24HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/24/18, 8:30 am, 12 HOB
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-07HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1622 (Same As) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1173

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
253025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288980Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3800555Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3800666Amended CodeSee Bill Text
380508Amended CodeSee Bill Text
380510Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1173
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1173/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1173/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1173/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1173/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1173/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1173/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1173/Amendment/249633/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1173/Amendment/962197/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1173/Amendment/095841/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1173/Vote/HouseVote_h01173e1800.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1173/Vote/SenateVote_h01173e1024.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1173/Vote/HouseVote_h01173e1883.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback