FL S1622 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1173
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1173
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing conditions under which specified appraisal standards are required for acquisition of military installation buffer lands; authorizing the use of certain funding sources for the immediate acquisition of lands that prevent or satisfy private property rights claims within areas of critical state concern; revising the definition of the term "nonconservation lands"; authorizing land authorities to contribute tourist impact tax revenues to counties for the construction, redevelopment, and preservation of certain affordable housing, etc.
Title
Lands Used for Governmental Purposes
Sponsors
Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security Committee | Senate Environmental Preservation and Conservation Committee | Sen. Anitere Flores [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1173 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1173 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | CS/CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time |
2018-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | CS/CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 02/15/18, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2018-02-07 | Senate | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Now in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 02/05/18, 4:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1173 (Same As) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-159
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
253 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
259 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 980 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 0666 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |