FL H1173 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes district to provide telecommunications infrastructure within the district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Seminole Improvement District, Palm Beach County

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-02HouseDied in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
2014-03-11HouseReferred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
2014-03-04HouseIntroduced
2014-02-27HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback