FL H1149 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises requirements for audit of Medicaid-related pharmacy records; authorizes third-party payor & third-party administrator audits of pharmacies; provides that claims containing certain clerical or recordkeeping errors are not subject to financial recoupment; specifies that certain audit criteria apply to third-party claims submitted after specified date, etc.
Title
Audits of Pharmacy Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Health & Family Services Policy Council -HJ 00103 | |
2010-03-01 | Referred to Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Health & Family Services Policy Council | |
2010-02-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2194 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Regulation