FL H1141 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Healthy Families Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Healthy Families Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires direct service transit providers to submit to background screening.
Title
Screening of Direct Service Transit Providers & Volunteers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Healthy Families Subcommittee |
2013-03-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Healthy Families Subcommittee, 03/25/13, 10:30 am, 12 HOB --Removed from meeting agenda |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Healthy Families Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1668 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Transportation
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1141 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1141/BillText/Filed/PDF |