FL H1133 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires certain defendants sentenced for primary offense of possession of controlled substance to be sentenced to nonstate prison sanction; authorizes defendant to move sentencing court to depart from mandatory minimum term of imprisonment or mandatory fine; revises principle of Criminal Punishment Code relating to prisoner's required minimum term of imprisonment; revises provisions relating to incentive gain-time; provides that certain persons convicted of noncapital offense & sentenced for term of life qualify for conditional release.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Justice

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-02-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1446 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
H1001 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S1212 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7125

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
775082Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775084Amended CodeSee Bill Text
921002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94470Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94713Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9471405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
947141Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback