FL H1129 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1458 (Ch. 2023-56)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1458 (Ch. 2023-56)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides operator of roller skating rink is not liable for damages or personal injury resulting from inherent risks of roller skating; provides certain persons assume inherent risk of roller skating; provides operator is not required to eliminate, alter, or control inherent risks in roller skating; establishes responsibilities of roller skaters; provides that failure to comply with such responsibilities constitutes negligence.
Title
Roller Skating Rink Safety
Sponsors
House Civil Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Susan Plasencia [R] | Rep. Melony Bell [R] | Rep. Randy Maggard [R] |
Rep. Michelle Salzman [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-11 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1458 (Ch. 2023-56) |
2023-04-11 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-11 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2023-04-07 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2023-04-05 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Original reference removed: Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-04-04 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-04-04 | House | CS Filed |
2023-04-04 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-04-04 | House | Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-31 | House | Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-06 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1458 (Similar To) 2023-05-12 - Chapter No. 2023-56