FL H1129 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Memorial to U.S. Congress, urging Congress to repeal & nullify all existing applications by Florida Legislature that call for Article V constitutional convention.
Title
Repeal of Applications for Article V Constitutional Convention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-03-08 | House | Referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1129 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1129/BillText/Filed/PDF |