FL H1129 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in K-20 Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in K-20 Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires charter school to maintain Internet website with information about school, its personnel, & its programs; requires specified information relating to agency that owns or manages school.
Title
Charter Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Luis Garcia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in K-20 Innovation Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 110 | |
2012-01-09 | Referred to K-20 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee -HJ 110 | |
2011-12-27 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1129 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1129/BillText/Filed/PDF |