FL H1127 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-19 - Now in Judiciary Committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes amendment to Section 3 of Article XI of State Constitution to limit revisions or amendments of State Constitution by citizen initiative to matters relating to procedural subjects or to structure of government or of State Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limiting Subject of Constitutional Amendments Proposed by Citizen Initiative

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-18 - House - House Public Integrity & Elections Committee (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-19HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2022-01-19HouseReported out of Public Integrity & Elections Committee
2022-01-18HouseFavorable by Public Integrity & Elections Committee
2022-01-13HouseAdded to Public Integrity & Elections Committee agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseNow in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee
2022-01-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1412 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Introduced

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback