FL H1127 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits person who is not licensed as engineer from using specified name or title; authorizes Board of Professional Engineers to establish fees relating to structural engineering licensing & refuse to certify applicant for a structural engineering license for certain reasons; prohibits certain persons from practicing structural engineering after specified date.
Title
Engineers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2020-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1214 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
471 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 019 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 0385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1127 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1127/BillText/Filed/PDF |