FL H1127 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-65
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-65
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates exemption from public records & meetings requirements for certain data & information held by Citizens Property Insurance Corporation relating to information technology security programs; authorizes certain entities or agencies to access such records; provides retroactive application; provides for future legislative review & repeal; provides statements of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec. and Meetings/Citizens Property Insurance Corporation
Sponsors
House Government Accountability Committee | House Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee | Rep. Larry Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#652 (Y: 108 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#652 (Y: 108 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Chapter No. 2018-65 | |
2018-03-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-07 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2018-03-07 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 1880 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2018-02-28 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-02-21 | House | CS passed; YEAS 108 NAYS 5 |
2018-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-20 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/20/18 |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-14 | House | CS/CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time |
2018-02-14 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-13 | House | CS/CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/13/18, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2018-01-23 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-23 | House | Favorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2018-01-18 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-18 | House | Now in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2018-01-17 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-17 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 01/17/18, 8:30 am, Morris Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-07 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1880 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1127
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
119 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 352 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |