FL H1127 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1715
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1715
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces to 2 percent from 6 percent amount of projected deficit in coastal account for prior calendar year which is recovered through regular assessments; requires that remaining projected deficits in personal & commercial lines accounts be recovered through emergency assessments after accounting for Citizens policyholder surcharge; requires OIR of FSC to notify assessable insurers & Florida Surplus Lines Service Office of dates assessable insurers shall collect & pay emergency assessments; removes reference to recoupment of residual market deficit assessments; requires board of governors to make determination that account has projected deficit before it levies Citizens policyholder surcharge; requires limited apportionment company begin collecting regular assessments within 90 days & pay in full within 15 months after assessment is levied; authorizes OIR to assist Citizens Property Insurance Corporation in collection of assessments; replaces term "market equalization surcharge" with term "policyholder surcharge."
Title
Citizens Property Insurance Corporation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#126 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#879 (Y: 89 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#879 (Y: 89 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1715 | |
2012-03-09 | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 1671 | |
2012-03-09 | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 1671 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 827 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 827 | |
2012-02-24 | In Messages | |
2012-02-23 | Passed; YEAS 89 NAYS 25 -HJ 781 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 3rd time -HJ 780 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-22 | Read 2nd time -HJ 730 | |
2012-02-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/22/12 | |
2012-02-09 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 573 | |
2012-02-08 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 9 NAYS 5 -HJ 573 | |
2012-02-06 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 02/08/12, 8:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-02-01 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 323 | |
2012-01-31 | Favorable by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 323 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/31/12, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall | |
2012-01-25 | Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 284 | |
2012-01-24 | Favorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 2 -HJ 284 | |
2012-01-20 | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/24/12, 2:00 pm, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-12 | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/17/12, 3:30 pm, 404 HOB --Workshopped | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 110 | |
2012-01-09 | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 110 | |
2011-12-27 | Filed |