FL H1119 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education & Employment Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1028 (Ch. 2021-35)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education & Employment Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1028 (Ch. 2021-35)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires public schools to provide specified information to certain parents or students.
Title
Water Safety and Swimming Certification for K-12 Students
Sponsors
House Early Learning and Elementary Education Subcommittee | Rep. Dan Daley [D] | Rep. Jim Mooney [R] | Rep. Chip LaMarca [R] |
Rep. Andrew Learned [D] | Rep. Angela Nixon [D] | Rep. Patricia Hawkins-Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - House Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Education & Employment Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1028 (Ch. 2021-35) |
2021-03-24 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Original reference removed: PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-23 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-23 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported out of Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Favorable with CS by Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-19 | House | Added to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-25 | House | Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S358 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Messages; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1028 (Ch. 2021-35)
S1028 (Similar To) 2021-06-02 - Chapter No. 2021-35, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 845 (Ch. 2021-217), CS/HB 1159 (Ch. 2021-228), CS/CS/SB 52 (Ch. 2021-160), CS/CS/SB 366 (Ch. 2021-162)
S1028 (Similar To) 2021-06-02 - Chapter No. 2021-35, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 845 (Ch. 2021-217), CS/HB 1159 (Ch. 2021-228), CS/CS/SB 52 (Ch. 2021-160), CS/CS/SB 366 (Ch. 2021-162)