FL H1119 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits certain acts by manufacturers of prescription contact lenses relating to retail sale, advertising, pricing, & distribution of contact lenses; prohibits use of contact lens distributor for certain purposes; provides for enforcement under Florida Deceptive & Unfair Trade Practices Act.
Title
Contact Lens Pricing Practices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee |
2015-03-08 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1400 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1119 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1119/BillText/Filed/PDF |