FL H1117 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Chapter No. 2024-292
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Chapter No. 2024-292
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Star Farms Village at North Port Stewardship District; establishes boundaries; provides for board of supervisors & election, membership, terms, meetings, & duties of board; provides method for transition of board from landowner control to control by resident electors; provides for district manager & treasurer; provides general & special powers of district; provides for bonds, borrowing, future ad valorem taxation, special assessments, issuance of certificates of indebtedness, & tax liens; provides for fees & charges; provides for referendum.
Title
City of North Port, Sarasota County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#27 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#806 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#806 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | Chapter No. 2024-292 | |
2024-06-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-06-07 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-07 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-07 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Received |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2024-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-03-04 | House | Passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0 |
2024-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-01 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-27 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2024) |
2024-02-07 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-07 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2024-01-31 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Favorable by Ways & Means Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda |
2024-01-25 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2024-01-23 | House | Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-09 | House | Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2024-01-03 | House | Filed |