FL H1115 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts from provisions governing cemeteries columbarium of specified size located on property of specified motorsports entertainment complex; requires that owner & subsequent owners of such complex ensure that columbarium is constructed & perpetually kept & maintained in certain manner, subject to certain provisions.
Title
Cemeteries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-31 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/31/11, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall --Temporarily deferred | |
2011-03-28 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 339 | |
2011-03-25 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-22 | CS by Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 326 | |
2011-03-18 | On Committee agenda-- Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee, 03/22/11, 8:30 am, 12 HOB | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 210 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 96 | |
2011-03-02 | Filed |