FL H1105 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for name of child's guardian ad litem or attorney ad litem to be entered on court orders in dependency proceedings; requires court to advise parents during adjudicatory hearing of actions required to achieve reunification; requires court to hold permanency hearings within specified timeframes until permanency is determined; requires court to enter written order of disposition of child following termination of parental rights within specified timeframe.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoption

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-24HouseNow in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
2018-01-23HouseFavorable by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-01-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 12 HOB
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-07HouseReferred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1650 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
H1079 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-103
S1360 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1079

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
39001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390136Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39522Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39621Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39811Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback