FL H1095 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires counties & municipalities to provide discounts on public park entrance fees to military members, veterans, & spouses & parents of certain deceased military members, law enforcement officers, firefighters, & emergency workers; requires regional transportation authorities to provide discounts on fares & charges to certain disabled veterans; defines "park entrance fees."
Title
Discounts on Public Park Entrance Fees & Transportation Fares
Sponsors
House Local and Federal Affairs Committee | Rep. Patrick Rooney [R] | Rep. Kionne McGhee [D] | Sen. Frank Artiles [R] |
Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] | Rep. George Moraitis [R] | Rep. Amanda Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#133 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-21 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-04-16 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (593677) |
2015-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/15/15 |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-31 | House | CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2015-03-31 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-26 | House | CS by- Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-24 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/26/15, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-03-19 | House | Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Favorable by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 03/18/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-03-12 | House | Now in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee |
2015-03-12 | House | Favorable by Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 03/12/15, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2015-03-08 | House | Referred to Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0721 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
S1430 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
S1430 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 029 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 58 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 0447 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |