FL H0721 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires counties & municipalities to provide discounts on park entrance fees to military servicemembers, veterans, & spouses & parents of certain deceased military servicemembers & first responders; defines "park entrance fees."
Title
County and Municipal Parks
Sponsors
House Local Government Affairs Subcommittee | Rep. Kionne McGhee [D] | Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] | Rep. Amanda Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | CS by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-11 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-10 | House | CS by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 03/10/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-03-04 | House | Now in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee |
2015-03-04 | House | Favorable by Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 03/04/15, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1430 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
H1095 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
H1095 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 028 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 0447 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |