FL H1091 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to prescribing, ordering, & dispensing of emergency opioid antagonists; requires DOH to develop & implement statewide awareness campaign to educate pubic regarding opioid overdoses, emergency opioid antagonists, & safe disposal of opioids; authorizes pharmacist to order emergency opioid antagonists; provides specified immunities; authorizes personnel of law enforcement agencies & other agencies to administer emergency opioid antagonists under certain circumstances.
Title
Substance Abuse Prevention
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-04-05 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-04-05 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-04-05 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-04-05 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-04-02 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-02 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-02 | House | Reported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable with CS by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | PCS added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-25 | House | Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1442 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 887 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 253 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |