FL H1087 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 231 (Ch. 2016-77)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 231 (Ch. 2016-77)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that licensee or third party comply with certain restrictions on reuse or disclosure of consumer data received from motor vehicle dealer, that upon request of motor vehicle dealer, licensee provide list of consumer data obtained & all persons to whom data has been disclosed, & that licensee indemnify motor vehicle dealer for certain claims or damages.
Title
Protection of Motor Vehicle Dealers' Consumer Data
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 231 (Ch. 2016-77) |
2016-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-18 | House | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 02/18/16, 8:00 am, Reed Hall |
2016-02-10 | House | Now in Economic Affairs Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/10/16, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2016-02-04 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | CS by Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-02-03 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-01 | House | CS by Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee, 02/01/16, 4:00 pm, 116 Knott Building |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0960 (Same As) 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 231 (Ch. 2016-77)
H0231 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Chapter No. 2016-77
H0231 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Chapter No. 2016-77
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 646 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 6992 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |