FL H0231 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter No. 2016-77
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter No. 2016-77
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions for denial, suspension, or revocation of license of manufacturer, factory branch, distributor, or importer of motor vehicles; revises provisions for certain audits of service-related payments or incentive payments to dealer by an applicant or licensee & timeframe for performance of such audits, provisions for denial or chargeback of claims, & provisions relating to certain adverse actions against dealer that sold or leased motor vehicle to customer who exported vehicle to foreign country or who resold vehicle; prohibits failure to make certain payments to motor vehicle dealer for temporary replacement vehicles & requiring or coercing dealer to purchase goods or services from vendor designated by applicant or licensee; & provides procedures for approval of dealer to purchase goods or services from vendor not designated by applicant or licensee.
Title
Motor Vehicle Manufacturer Licenses
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Business and Professions Subcommittee | Rep. Carlos Trujillo [R] | Sen. Frank Artiles [R] |
Sen. Bryan Avila [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#43 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#714 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#714 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Chapter No. 2016-77 | |
2016-03-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-04 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-04 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 960 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Rules |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Received |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Rules |
2016-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-03-04 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-03 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (027651, 418357) |
2016-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-01 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/16 |
2016-02-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-26 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-26 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-25 | House | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-23 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/25/16, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2016-02-09 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2016-02-09 | House | CS referred to Judiciary Committee |
2016-02-09 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee |
2016-02-08 | House | CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-02-08 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-02 | House | CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1 |
2016-01-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 02/02/16, 10:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-10-07 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-09-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0430 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 231 (Ch. 2016-77)
S1394 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 231 (Ch. 2016-77), HB 7027 (Ch. 2016-181), CS/CS/HB 7061 (Ch. 2016-239)
H1087 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 231 (Ch. 2016-77)
S0960 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 231 (Ch. 2016-77)
S1394 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 231 (Ch. 2016-77), HB 7027 (Ch. 2016-181), CS/CS/HB 7061 (Ch. 2016-239)
H1087 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 231 (Ch. 2016-77)
S0960 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 231 (Ch. 2016-77)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 646 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 6992 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |