FL H1087 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies on-beach parking areas. EFFECTIVE DATE: Upon becoming law.
Title
Nassau County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00097 | |
2010-03-01 | Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2010-02-16 | Filed |